House | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 2294 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2294 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1767 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1611 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1362 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1362 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1362 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1362 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1362 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1362 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1362 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |