Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1743 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1743
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 April 1, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 3, Nays 0; April 1, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1743 By: Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of money from the Texas Enterprise Fund to
 recruit automotive manufacturing facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 481.078, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e-2) to read as follows:
 (e-2)  Notwithstanding Subsection (e-1), a municipality, a
 development corporation authorized to be created by the
 municipality, or both the municipality and a development
 corporation authorized to be created by the municipality are
 eligible to receive a grant under this section for the purpose of
 recruiting an automotive manufacturing facility. A particular
 municipality, including all of the municipality's related
 development corporations, may not receive more than $50 million in
 grants under this subsection in a state fiscal year. A municipality
 may apply for a grant under this section in the same manner as a
 business entity. In this subsection, "development corporation"
 means a corporation authorized to be created by a municipality
 under the Development Corporation Act (Subtitle C1, Title 12, Local
 Government Code).
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *