E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6035
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4653
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4653
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4653
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4637
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3299
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4833
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1205
|
Journal Page: 4832
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4832
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Leibowitz
|
Journal Page: 4830
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1134
|
Journal Page: 4719
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4719
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Branch
|
Journal Page: 4702
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
58-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 4702
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
57-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4701
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4701
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4701
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
56-England
|
Journal Page: 4699
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4686
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4677
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4675
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 4669
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
16-HIlderbran
|
Journal Page: 4299
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4298
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1055
|
Journal Page: 4297
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 4297
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
16-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 4297
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
15-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 4296
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
14-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 4295
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment to amendment adopted as substituted
|
2-Branch and D. Howard
|
Journal Page: 4285
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Substitute amendment to amendment adopted
|
3-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 4285
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Substitute amendment to amendment offered
|
3-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 4284
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Branch
|
Journal Page: 4281
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 4281
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 4280
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4280
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3953
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 West
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA5 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA8 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 675
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 670
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 668
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 584
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 500
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 438
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 197
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 197
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|