Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB175 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapiro S.B. No. 175
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 10, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 9, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 4,
 Nays 1; March 9, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to limitations on the automatic admission of undergraduate
 students to general academic teaching institutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 51.803, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a) Subject to Subsection (a-1), each [Each] general
 academic teaching institution shall admit an applicant for
 admission to the institution as an undergraduate student if the
 applicant graduated with a grade point average in the top 10 percent
 of the student's high school graduating class in one of the two
 school years preceding the academic year for which the applicant is
 applying for admission and:
 (1) the applicant graduated from a public or private
 high school in this state accredited by a generally recognized
 accrediting organization or from a high school operated by the
 United States Department of Defense;
 (2) the applicant:
 (A) successfully completed:
 (i) at a public high school, the curriculum
 requirements established under Section 28.025 for the recommended
 or advanced high school program; or
 (ii) at a high school to which Section
 28.025 does not apply, a curriculum that is equivalent in content
 and rigor to the recommended or advanced high school program; or
 (B) satisfied ACT's College Readiness Benchmarks
 on the ACT assessment applicable to the applicant or earned on the
 SAT assessment a score of at least 1,500 out of 2,400 or the
 equivalent; and
 (3) if the applicant graduated from a high school
 operated by the United States Department of Defense, the applicant
 is a Texas resident under Section 54.052 or is entitled to pay
 tuition fees at the rate provided for Texas residents under Section
 54.058(d) for the term or semester to which admitted.
 (a-1)  A general academic teaching institution is not
 required to admit under Subsection (a) more than 50 percent of the
 institution's first-time resident undergraduate students in an
 academic year. If the number of applicants who qualify for
 automatic admission to a general academic teaching institution
 under Subsection (a) exceeds 50 percent of the institution's
 enrollment capacity designated for first-time resident
 undergraduate students, the institution may elect to offer
 admission to those applicants as provided by this subsection and
 not as otherwise required by Subsection (a). If the institution
 elects to offer admission under this subsection, the institution
 shall offer admission to those applicants by percentile rank
 according to graduating class standing based on grade point
 average, beginning with the top percentile rank, until the
 applicants qualified under Subsection (a) have been offered
 admission in the number estimated in good faith by the institution
 as sufficient to fill 50 percent of the institution's enrollment
 capacity designated for first-time resident undergraduate
 students, except that the institution must offer admission to all
 applicants with the same percentile rank. The institution shall
 consider any remaining applicants qualified for automatic
 admission under Subsection (a) in the same manner as other
 applicants for admission as first-time undergraduate students in
 accordance with Section 51.805.
 (a-2)  In the manner prescribed by the Texas Education Agency
 and not later than April 15, a general academic teaching
 institution shall provide to each school district, for
 dissemination of the information to high school junior-level
 students and their parents, notice of which percentile ranks of
 high school senior-level students are anticipated by the
 institution to be automatically offered admission under Subsection
 (a-1) during the next school year if:
 (1)  the number of applicants to the institution during
 the current school year who qualify for automatic admission to the
 institution under Subsection (a) exceeds 50 percent of the
 institution's enrollment capacity designated for first-time
 resident undergraduate students; and
 (2)  the institution plans to offer admission under
 Subsection (a-1) during the next school year.
 SECTION 2. Section 28.026, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 28.026. NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC COLLEGE ADMISSION. (a)
 The board of trustees of a school district shall require each high
 school in the district to post appropriate signs in each
 counselor's office, in each principal's office, and in each
 administrative building indicating the substance of Section 51.803
 regarding automatic college admission. To assist in the
 dissemination of this information, the school district shall:
 (1) require that each high school counselor and class
 advisor be provided a detailed explanation of the substance of
 Section 51.803;
 (2) provide each district student, at the time the
 student first registers for one or more classes required for high
 school graduation, with a written notification of the substance of
 Section 51.803;
 (3) require that each high school counselor and senior
 class advisor explain to eligible students the substance of Section
 51.803; and
 (4) [(3)] provide each eligible senior student under
 Section 51.803, at the commencement of a class's senior year, with a
 written notification of the student's eligibility with a detailed
 explanation of the substance of Section 51.803.
 (b)  The commissioner shall adopt forms to use in providing
 notice under Subsections (a)(2) and (4). In providing notice under
 Subsection (a)(2) or (4), a school district shall use the
 appropriate form adopted by the commissioner.
 (c)  The commissioner shall adopt procedures to ensure that,
 as soon as practicable after this subsection becomes law, each
 school district provides written notification of the substance of
 Section 51.803, as amended by the 81st Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2009, to each district student who, for the 2009-2010
 school year, registers for one or more courses required for high
 school graduation. The commissioner may adopt rules under this
 subsection in the manner provided by law for emergency rules. Each
 district shall comply with the procedures adopted by the
 commissioner under this subsection. This subsection expires
 September 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act to Section
 51.803, Education Code, applies beginning with admissions to a
 general academic teaching institution for the 2010-2011 academic
 year. Admissions to a general academic teaching institution for an
 academic period before that academic year are governed by the law in
 effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *