House | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2294 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2294 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1929 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1712 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1640 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1640 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1640 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1640 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 632 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 632 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |