Senate | 04/22/2009 | Ordered not printed | Journal Page: 1351 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 1351 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably as amended | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 632 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 632 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |