Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1757 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1757
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 16, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 16, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1757 By: Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality of methods for disposing of unused pharmaceuticals so that
 they do not enter a wastewater system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "commission" means the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
 (b) The commission shall study and make recommendations
 regarding the methods to be used by consumers, health care
 providers, and others for disposing of unused pharmaceuticals so
 that they do not enter a wastewater system. In conducting the
 study, the commission shall consider:
 (1) the methods currently used in this state by
 consumers, health care providers, and others for that purpose;
 (2) alternative methods used for that purpose,
 including the methods used in other states; and
 (3) the effects on public health and the environment
 of the various methods used for that purpose.
 (c) In conducting the study, the commission may solicit
 input from:
 (1) the Health and Human Services Commission;
 (2) the Department of Public Safety of the State of
 Texas;
 (3) pharmaceutical manufacturers;
 (4) pharmacies;
 (5) health care providers, including home health care
 providers;
 (6) hospitals;
 (7) clinics;
 (8) long-term care facilities;
 (9) entities that engage in medical waste processing
 and handling;
 (10) solid waste management service providers;
 (11) local governments;
 (12) ranchers and farmers;
 (13) end users of medication;
 (14) water utilities and other water suppliers;
 (15) the United States Postal Service;
 (16) the United States Environmental Protection
 Agency; and
 (17) any other entity the commission considers
 necessary.
 (d) Not later than December 1, 2010, the commission shall
 submit a report of the results of the study to the legislature. The
 report must include:
 (1) the commission's recommendations regarding the
 methods to be used by consumers, health care providers, and others
 for disposing of unused pharmaceuticals so that they do not enter a
 wastewater system; and
 (2) an analysis of the feasibility of implementing the
 recommended disposal methods on a statewide basis.
 (e) This Act expires January 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *