1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 1757 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to a study by the Texas Commission on Environmental |
---|
6 | 6 | | Quality of methods for disposing of unused pharmaceuticals so that |
---|
7 | 7 | | they do not enter a wastewater system. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "commission" means the |
---|
10 | 10 | | Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. |
---|
11 | 11 | | (b) The commission shall study and make recommendations |
---|
12 | 12 | | regarding the methods to be used by consumers, health care |
---|
13 | 13 | | providers, and others for disposing of unused pharmaceuticals so |
---|
14 | 14 | | that they do not enter a wastewater system. In conducting the |
---|
15 | 15 | | study, the commission shall consider: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) the methods currently used in this state by |
---|
17 | 17 | | consumers, health care providers, and others for that purpose; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (2) alternative methods used for that purpose, |
---|
19 | 19 | | including the methods used in other states; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | (3) the effects on public health and the environment |
---|
21 | 21 | | of the various methods used for that purpose. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (c) In conducting the study, the commission may solicit |
---|
23 | 23 | | input from: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) the Health and Human Services Commission; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (2) the Department of Public Safety of the State of |
---|
26 | 26 | | Texas; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (3) pharmaceutical manufacturers; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (4) pharmacies; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (5) health care providers, including home health care |
---|
30 | 30 | | providers; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (6) hospitals; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (7) clinics; |
---|
33 | 33 | | (8) long-term care facilities; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (9) entities that engage in medical waste processing |
---|
35 | 35 | | and handling; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (10) solid waste management service providers; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (11) local governments; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (12) ranchers and farmers; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (13) end users of medication; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (14) water utilities and other water suppliers; |
---|
41 | 41 | | (15) the United States Postal Service; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (16) the United States Environmental Protection |
---|
43 | 43 | | Agency; and |
---|
44 | 44 | | (17) any other entity the commission considers |
---|
45 | 45 | | necessary. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (d) Not later than December 1, 2010, the commission shall |
---|
47 | 47 | | submit a report of the results of the study to the legislature. The |
---|
48 | 48 | | report must include: |
---|
49 | 49 | | (1) the commission's recommendations regarding the |
---|
50 | 50 | | methods to be used by consumers, health care providers, and others |
---|
51 | 51 | | for disposing of unused pharmaceuticals so that they do not enter a |
---|
52 | 52 | | wastewater system; and |
---|
53 | 53 | | (2) an analysis of the feasibility of implementing the |
---|
54 | 54 | | recommended disposal methods on a statewide basis. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (e) This Act expires January 1, 2011. |
---|
56 | 56 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
57 | 57 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
58 | 58 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
59 | 59 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
60 | 60 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
61 | 61 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
62 | 62 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
63 | 63 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1757 passed the Senate on |
---|
64 | 64 | | April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
65 | 65 | | May 29, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and |
---|
66 | 66 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House |
---|
67 | 67 | | granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
68 | 68 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
69 | 69 | | Nays 0. |
---|
70 | 70 | | ______________________________ |
---|
71 | 71 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
72 | 72 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1757 passed the House, with |
---|
73 | 73 | | amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147, |
---|
74 | 74 | | Nays 1, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted request |
---|
75 | 75 | | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
76 | 76 | | May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
77 | 77 | | following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
78 | 78 | | ______________________________ |
---|
79 | 79 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
80 | 80 | | Approved: |
---|
81 | 81 | | ______________________________ |
---|
82 | 82 | | Date |
---|
83 | 83 | | ______________________________ |
---|
84 | 84 | | Governor |
---|