Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1764 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1764
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 29, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 29, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dissemination of information regarding the cost of
 attending public and private institutions of higher education and
 regarding the availability of financial aid to assist in paying
 that cost.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0777 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0777.  UNIFORM STANDARDS FOR PUBLICATION OF COST OF
 ATTENDANCE INFORMATION. (a)  The board shall prescribe uniform
 standards intended to ensure that information regarding the cost of
 attendance at institutions of higher education and at private or
 independent institutions of higher education approved under
 Subchapter F to receive tuition equalization grant funds is
 available to the public in a manner that is consumer-friendly and
 readily understandable to prospective students and their families.
 In developing the standards, the board shall examine common and
 recommended practices regarding the publication of such
 information and shall solicit recommendations and comments from
 institutions of higher education and affected private or
 independent institutions of higher education.
 (b) The uniform standards must:
 (1)  address all of the elements that constitute the
 total cost of attendance, including tuition and fees, room and
 board costs, book and supply costs, transportation costs, and other
 personal expenses; and
 (2)  prescribe model language to be used to describe
 each element of the cost of attendance.
 (c)  Each institution of higher education and each private or
 independent institution of higher education approved under
 Subchapter F to receive tuition equalization grant funds that
 offers an undergraduate degree or certificate program shall:
 (1)  prominently display on the institution's Internet
 website in accordance with the uniform standards prescribed under
 this section information regarding the cost of attendance at the
 institution by a full-time entering first-year student; and
 (2)  conform to the uniform standards in any electronic
 or printed materials intended to provide to prospective
 undergraduate students information regarding the cost of
 attendance at the institution.
 (d)  Institutions described by Subsection (c) shall consider
 the uniform standards prescribed under this section when providing
 information to the public or to prospective students regarding the
 cost of attendance at the institution by nonresident students,
 graduate students, or students enrolled in professional programs.
 (e)  The board shall prescribe requirements for an
 institution described by Subsection (c) to provide on the
 institution's Internet website consumer-friendly and readily
 understandable information regarding student financial aid
 opportunities. The required information must be provided in
 connection with the information displayed under Subsection (c)(1)
 and must include a link to the primary federal student financial aid
 Internet website intended to assist persons applying for student
 financial aid.
 (f)  The board shall provide on the board's Internet website
 a program or similar tool that will compute for a person accessing
 the website the estimated net cost of attendance for a full-time
 entering first-year student attending an institution described by
 Subsection (c). The board shall require each of those institutions
 to provide the board with the information the board requires to
 administer this subsection.
 (g)  The board shall prescribe the initial standards and
 requirements under this section not later than January 1, 2010.
 Institutions of higher education shall comply with the standards
 and requirements not later than April l, 2010. This subsection
 expires January 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *