Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1764 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1764


 AN ACT
 relating to the dissemination of information regarding the cost of
 attending public and private institutions of higher education and
 regarding the availability of financial aid to assist in paying
 that cost.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0777 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0777.  UNIFORM STANDARDS FOR PUBLICATION OF COST OF
 ATTENDANCE INFORMATION. (a)  The board shall prescribe uniform
 standards intended to ensure that information regarding the cost of
 attendance at institutions of higher education is available to the
 public in a manner that is consumer-friendly and readily
 understandable to prospective students and their families. In
 developing the standards, the board shall examine common and
 recommended practices regarding the publication of such
 information and shall solicit recommendations and comments from
 institutions of higher education and interested private or
 independent institutions of higher education.
 (b) The uniform standards must:
 (1)  address all of the elements that constitute the
 total cost of attendance, including tuition and fees, room and
 board costs, book and supply costs, transportation costs, and other
 personal expenses; and
 (2)  prescribe model language to be used to describe
 each element of the cost of attendance.
 (c)  Each institution of higher education that offers an
 undergraduate degree or certificate program shall:
 (1)  prominently display on the institution's Internet
 website in accordance with the uniform standards prescribed under
 this section information regarding the cost of attendance at the
 institution by a full-time entering first-year student; and
 (2)  conform to the uniform standards in any electronic
 or printed materials intended to provide to prospective
 undergraduate students information regarding the cost of
 attendance at the institution.
 (d)  Each institution of higher education shall consider the
 uniform standards prescribed under this section when providing
 information to the public or to prospective students regarding the
 cost of attendance at the institution by nonresident students,
 graduate students, or students enrolled in professional programs.
 (e)  The board shall prescribe requirements for an
 institution of higher education to provide on the institution's
 Internet website consumer-friendly and readily understandable
 information regarding student financial aid opportunities. The
 required information must be provided in connection with the
 information displayed under Subsection (c)(1) and must include a
 link to the primary federal student financial aid Internet website
 intended to assist persons applying for student financial aid.
 (f)  The board shall provide on the board's Internet website
 a program or similar tool that will compute for a person accessing
 the website the estimated net cost of attendance for a full-time
 entering first-year student attending an institution of higher
 education. The board shall require each institution to provide the
 board with the information the board requires to administer this
 subsection.
 (g)  The board shall prescribe the initial standards and
 requirements under this section not later than January 1, 2010.
 Institutions of higher education shall comply with the standards
 and requirements not later than April l, 2010. This subsection
 expires January 1, 2011.
 (h)  The board shall encourage private or independent
 institutions of higher education approved under Subchapter F to
 participate in the tuition equalization grant program, to the
 greatest extent practicable, to prominently display the
 information described by Subsections (a) and (b) on their Internet
 websites in accordance with the standards established under those
 subsections, and to conform to those standards in electronic and
 printed materials intended to provide to prospective undergraduate
 students information regarding the cost of attendance at the
 institutions. The board shall also encourage those institutions to
 include on their Internet websites a link to the primary federal
 student financial aid Internet website intended to assist persons
 applying for student financial aid.
 (i)  The board shall make the program or tool described by
 Subsection (f) available to private or independent institutions of
 higher education described by Subsection (h), and those
 institutions shall make that program or tool, or another program or
 tool that complies with the requirements for the net price
 calculator required under Section 132(h)(3), Higher Education Act
 of 1965 (20 U.S.C. Section 1015a), available on their Internet
 websites not later than the date by which the institutions are
 required by Section 132(h)(3) to make the net price calculator
 publicly available on their Internet websites.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1764 passed the Senate on
 May 5, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1764 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor