House | 05/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2298 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1794 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1794 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1794 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1794 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1793 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1793 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1793 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Watson | Journal Page: 1793 |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1793 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1793 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 633 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 633 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |