House | 05/24/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2431 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1997 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1899 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1899 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1899 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1899 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1899 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1899 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1898 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Fraser | Journal Page: 1898 |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1898 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1898 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 633 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 633 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |