Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1772 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Fraser S.B. No. 1772
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 24, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 24, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1772 By: Fraser


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Public Utility Commission of Texas
 to address market power abuse, including the right to order
 restitution for violations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.157, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a) The commission shall monitor market power associated
 with the generation, transmission, distribution, and sale of
 electricity in this state. On a finding that market power abuses or
 other violations of this section are occurring, the commission
 shall require reasonable mitigation of the market power by ordering
 the construction of additional transmission or distribution
 facilities, by seeking an injunction or civil penalties as
 necessary to eliminate or to remedy the market power abuse or
 violation as authorized by Chapter 15, by ordering a person to cease
 a practice that the commission finds is a market power abuse, by
 imposing an administrative penalty as authorized by Chapter 15, or
 by suspending, revoking, or amending a certificate or registration
 as authorized by Section 39.356. Section 15.024(c) does not apply
 to an administrative penalty imposed under this section. In lieu of
 assessing an administrative penalty as authorized by Section 15.024
 and this section, the commission may order any person found to have
 committed market power abuse to refund to entities directly
 affected by the abuse an amount not to exceed the greater of the
 administrative penalty that would otherwise be ordered by the
 commission or one hundred and fifteen percent of the amount of
 additional profit that the person received as a result of the market
 power abuse. For purposes of this subchapter, market power abuses
 are practices by persons possessing market power that are
 unreasonably discriminatory or tend to unreasonably restrict,
 impair, or reduce the level of competition, including practices
 that tie unregulated products or services to regulated products or
 services or unreasonably discriminate in the provision of regulated
 services. For purposes of this section, "market power abuses"
 include predatory pricing, withholding of production, precluding
 entry, and collusion. A violation of the code of conduct provided
 by Subsection (d) that materially impairs the ability of a person to
 compete in a competitive market shall be deemed to be an abuse of
 market power. The possession of a high market share in a market
 open to competition may not, of itself, be deemed to be an abuse of
 market power; however, this sentence shall not affect the
 application of state and federal antitrust laws.
 (a-1)  The office shall be permitted to intervene in any
 proceeding concerning market power abuse or market manipulation.
 The commission may allow intervention to any party that
 demonstrates that the party has been directly affected by market
 power abuse, if the commission finds that participation by the
 party will not unduly delay the proceeding or prejudice the rights
 of the party accused of market power abuse. The commission may
 limit the scope of intervention of a party other than the office,
 including limits on discovery and the number of interrogatories
 that the party may issue on the person accused of market power abuse
 and commission staff.  The commission shall take all necessary
 steps to ensure that trade secrets, proprietary information and
 business strategies, and any other competitively sensitive
 information is adequately protected from disclosure to competitors
 or customers of the person accused of market power abuse.
 (a-2)  Following a proceeding related to market power abuse
 in which the commission determines that refunds are appropriate,
 the commission shall conduct a proceeding to determine the proper
 method of distributing the refunds to entities directly affected by
 the market power abuse. Any entity directly affected by the abuse
 may intervene in the proceeding.
 SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a violation that occurs or continues to occur on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A violation that occurred before the
 effective date of this Act is covered by the law in effect at the
 time the violation occurred, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *