Senate | 05/19/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Referred to s/c by chair | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |