Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1778 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harris S.B. No. 1778
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 April 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 3,
 Nays 0; April 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of property used in connection with a
 data center for economic benefits authorized by the Texas Economic
 Development Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 313.024, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b) To be eligible for a limitation on appraised value under
 this subchapter, the entity must use the property in connection
 with:
 (1) manufacturing;
 (2) research and development;
 (3) a clean coal project, as defined by Section 5.001,
 Water Code;
 (4) an advanced clean energy project, as defined by
 Section 382.003, Health and Safety Code;
 (5) renewable energy electric generation;
 (6) electric power generation using integrated
 gasification combined cycle technology; [or]
 (7) nuclear electric power generation; or
 (8) a data center.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (e), Section 313.024, Tax Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (5) to read as follows:
 (5)  "Data center" means an establishment primarily
 engaged in providing electronic data processing and storage
 services described in categories 518210 and 541513 of the 2007
 North American Industry Classification System.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *