Senate | 05/01/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1714 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1354 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |