House
|
05/27/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 5113
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2212
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 635
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 635
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 513
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|