1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 1804 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to medical assistance reimbursement for wheeled mobility |
---|
6 | 6 | | systems for recipients of medical assistance. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, |
---|
9 | 9 | | is amended by adding Section 32.0424 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | Sec. 32.0424. REIMBURSEMENT FOR WHEELED MOBILITY SYSTEMS. |
---|
11 | 11 | | (a) In this section: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (1) "Qualified rehabilitation professional" means a |
---|
13 | 13 | | person who: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (A) holds a certification as an assistive |
---|
15 | 15 | | technology professional or a rehabilitation engineering |
---|
16 | 16 | | technologist issued by, and is in good standing with, the |
---|
17 | 17 | | Rehabilitation Engineering and Assistive Technology Society of |
---|
18 | 18 | | North America, provided that the requirements for that |
---|
19 | 19 | | certification are at least as stringent as the requirements in |
---|
20 | 20 | | effect on January 1, 2009; or |
---|
21 | 21 | | (B) is otherwise qualified to conduct the |
---|
22 | 22 | | professional activities of a person who holds a certification |
---|
23 | 23 | | described by Paragraph (A), as determined by rules adopted by the |
---|
24 | 24 | | executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (2) "Wheeled mobility system" means an item of durable |
---|
26 | 26 | | medical equipment that is a customized powered or manual mobility |
---|
27 | 27 | | device or a feature or component of the device, including the |
---|
28 | 28 | | following features and components: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (A) seated positioning components; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (B) powered or manual seating options; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (C) specialty driving controls; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (D) multiple adjustment frame; |
---|
33 | 33 | | (E) nonstandard performance options; and |
---|
34 | 34 | | (F) other complex or specialized components. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (b) The department may provide medical assistance |
---|
36 | 36 | | reimbursement for the provision of, or the performance of a major |
---|
37 | 37 | | modification to, a wheeled mobility system only if: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (1) the system is delivered to a recipient by a medical |
---|
39 | 39 | | assistance provider that is, or directly employs or contracts with, |
---|
40 | 40 | | a qualified rehabilitation professional and that professional was |
---|
41 | 41 | | present and involved in any clinical assessment of the recipient |
---|
42 | 42 | | that is required for obtaining the system; and |
---|
43 | 43 | | (2) at the time the wheeled mobility system is |
---|
44 | 44 | | delivered to the recipient, the qualified rehabilitation |
---|
45 | 45 | | professional: |
---|
46 | 46 | | (A) is present for and directs a fitting to |
---|
47 | 47 | | ensure that the system is appropriate for the recipient; and |
---|
48 | 48 | | (B) verifies that the system functions relative |
---|
49 | 49 | | to the recipient. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (c) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human |
---|
51 | 51 | | Services Commission shall adopt rules specifying: |
---|
52 | 52 | | (1) the scope, including any required components, of |
---|
53 | 53 | | the fitting and verification of functionality required by |
---|
54 | 54 | | Subsection (b); |
---|
55 | 55 | | (2) documentation of the fitting and verification of |
---|
56 | 56 | | functionality that must be submitted as part of a claim for |
---|
57 | 57 | | reimbursement for the provision or modification of a wheeled |
---|
58 | 58 | | mobility system; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | (3) the appropriate reimbursement methodology for |
---|
60 | 60 | | compensating the evaluation and final fitting services provided by |
---|
61 | 61 | | qualified rehabilitation professionals involved in the provision |
---|
62 | 62 | | or modification of wheeled mobility systems. |
---|
63 | 63 | | SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2011, the executive |
---|
64 | 64 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
65 | 65 | | adopt the rules required by Subsection (c), Section 32.0424, Human |
---|
66 | 66 | | Resources Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
67 | 67 | | SECTION 3. The changes in law made by Section 32.0424, Human |
---|
68 | 68 | | Resources Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a claim for |
---|
69 | 69 | | medical assistance reimbursement made for a wheeled mobility system |
---|
70 | 70 | | that is delivered on or after September 1, 2011. A claim for |
---|
71 | 71 | | medical assistance reimbursement made for a system that is |
---|
72 | 72 | | delivered before that date is governed by the law in effect on the |
---|
73 | 73 | | date the system was delivered, and that law is continued in effect |
---|
74 | 74 | | for that purpose. |
---|
75 | 75 | | SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
76 | 76 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
77 | 77 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
78 | 78 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
79 | 79 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
80 | 80 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
81 | 81 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
82 | 82 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
83 | 83 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
84 | 84 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1804 passed the Senate on |
---|
85 | 85 | | May 6, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the |
---|
86 | 86 | | Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the |
---|
87 | 87 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
88 | 88 | | ______________________________ |
---|
89 | 89 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
90 | 90 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1804 passed the House, with |
---|
91 | 91 | | amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, |
---|
92 | 92 | | Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
93 | 93 | | ______________________________ |
---|
94 | 94 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
95 | 95 | | Approved: |
---|
96 | 96 | | ______________________________ |
---|
97 | 97 | | Date |
---|
98 | 98 | | ______________________________ |
---|
99 | 99 | | Governor |
---|