Senate | 05/07/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 902 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 853 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 824 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 636 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 636 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |