House | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1195 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1195 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1195 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1194 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1194 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1194 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Duncan | Journal Page: 1194 |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1194 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1194 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1193 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 994 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 637 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 637 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |