E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5157 | |
E | 05/22/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2760 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4350 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2732 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2759 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2639 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4122 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | RV#1015 | Journal Page: 4121 |
House | 05/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 4121 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4121 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 1655 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1655 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1274 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1065 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1065 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1065 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1065 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1065 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1065 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1065 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 637 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 637 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |