Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1816 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 1816
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
44 May 5, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
55 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 5, 2009, sent
66 to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1816 By: Uresti
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to the pilot program for reporting of methicillin-resistant
1313 Staphylococcus aureus infections.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Section 81.0445, Health and Safety Code, is
1616 amended to read as follows:
1717 Sec. 81.0445. MRSA REPORTING PROCEDURES PILOT PROGRAM.
1818 (a) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services
1919 Commission by rule shall develop and the department shall establish
2020 a pilot program to research and implement procedures for reporting
2121 cases of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus (MRSA)
2222 infection. A health authority shall not be required to participate
2323 in the pilot program.
2424 (b) A health authority that participates in the pilot
2525 program shall administer the program locally and report to the
2626 department as required by this section [The department shall select
2727 to administer the program a health authority that:
2828 [(1) demonstrates an interest in hosting the program;
2929 and
3030 [(2) possesses adequate resources to administer the
3131 program successfully].
3232 (c) The pilot program must:
3333 (1) require all clinical laboratories, including
3434 hospital laboratories and clinical reference laboratories, within
3535 the area served by each [the] health authority participating in the
3636 pilot program to report all positive cases of methicillin-resistant
3737 Staphylococcus aureus infection, including infections contracted
3838 in a community setting, a health care facility, and any other
3939 setting, to the applicable health authority using automated and
4040 secure electronic data transmission [pilot program administrator];
4141 (2) track the prevalence of methicillin-resistant
4242 Staphylococcus aureus infections;
4343 (3) evaluate [study] the cost and feasibility of
4444 expanding the list of reportable diseases established under this
4545 chapter to include methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus
4646 infections;
4747 (4) develop a methodology for the electronic transfer
4848 [exchange] of information regarding [the occurrence of]
4949 methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus infections within the
5050 area served by each [the] health authority participating in the
5151 pilot program;
5252 (5) collect data and analyze findings regarding the
5353 prevalence [sources and possible prevention] of
5454 methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus infections;
5555 (6) provide for the reporting to the public by the
5656 department of information regarding methicillin-resistant
5757 Staphylococcus aureus infections;
5858 (7) compile and make available to the public a summary
5959 report[, by location, of the infections reported]; and
6060 (8) make recommendations to the department regarding
6161 Subdivisions (1) through (7).
6262 (d) Not later than September 1, 2011 [2009], the department,
6363 in consultation with each [the] health authority participating in
6464 [administering] the pilot program, shall submit to the legislature
6565 a report concerning the effectiveness of the pilot program [in
6666 tracking and reducing the number of methicillin-resistant
6767 Staphylococcus aureus infections within the area served by the
6868 health authority].
6969 (d-1) A health care facility located in an area served by a
7070 health authority participating in the pilot program is not required
7171 to report an incident of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus
7272 aureus infection to the Department of State Health Services under
7373 Section 98.103, as added by Chapter 359 (S.B. 288), Acts of the 80th
7474 Legislature, Regular Session, 2007. The health authority shall
7575 report each incident subject to Section 98.103 to the Department of
7676 State Health Services.
7777 (e) This section expires, and the pilot program is
7878 abolished, September 1, 2011 [2009].
7979 SECTION 2. Section 98.103, Health and Safety Code, as added
8080 by Chapter 359 (S.B. 288), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular
8181 Session, 2007, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as
8282 follows:
8383 (e) Effective September 1, 2009, this section does not apply
8484 to the reporting of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus
8585 infections by a health care facility located in an area served by a
8686 health authority participating in the pilot program established
8787 under Section 81.0445. This subsection expires September 1, 2011.
8888 SECTION 3. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
8989 this section, this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a
9090 vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
9191 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
9292 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
9393 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
9494 legislative session.
9595 (b) The change in law made by this Act to Subsection (d),
9696 Section 81.0445, Health and Safety Code, takes effect September 1,
9797 2009.
9898 * * * * *