House
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3170
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3170
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1897
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1897
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 1897
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Shapleigh
|
Journal Page: 1897
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Amended
|
FA1 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Shapleigh
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1780
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 512
|
Senate
|
03/16/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 500
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 330
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 198
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 198
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|