E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6914
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4131
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5143
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5070
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5070
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3939
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3678
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2386
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2386
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2386
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2386
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|