Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1827 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1827


 AN ACT
 relating to the constituting of certain sales of a used motor
 vehicle as a private disposition for purposes of Chapter 9,
 Business & Commerce Code.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 503, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 503.040 to read as follows:
 Sec. 503.040.  SALES OF CERTAIN USED MOTOR VEHICLES
 CONSTITUTE PRIVATE DISPOSITION. (a)  This section applies only to
 the sale of a used motor vehicle that constitutes collateral by a
 secured party acting under Chapter 9, Business & Commerce Code, and
 occurs at an auction conducted by an independent motor vehicle
 dealer:
 (1)  at which neither the debtor nor the secured party
 is permitted to bid; and
 (2)  for which there has been no advertisement or
 public notice before the sale that specifically describes the
 collateral to be sold, other than the inclusion of the motor vehicle
 in a list of the vehicles to be offered at the auction made
 available to potential bidders at the auction.
 (b)  The sale of the used motor vehicle constitutes a private
 disposition for purposes of Chapter 9, Business & Commerce Code.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by Section 503.040,
 Transportation Code, as added by this Act, applies only to a sale of
 collateral consisting of a used motor vehicle that occurs on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A sale of such collateral
 that occurs before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law applicable to the sale immediately before the effective date of
 this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1827 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1827 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor