E | 05/23/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | ||
E | 05/14/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2395 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3673 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2370 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2395 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2317 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#768 | Journal Page: 3237 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3237 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3237 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3100 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3100 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 493 | Journal Page: 3100 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2124 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1162 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1162 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1162 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |