Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1837 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center S.B. 1837 81R12349 YDB-D By: Patrick, Dan  Health & Human Services  4/9/2009  As Filed     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   The Texas Bleeding Disorders Advisory Council (council) was created upon passage of S.B. 1566, Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, as a two-year study of issues that affect the health and well-being of persons with bleeding disorders, such as hemophilia, in Texas.   As proposed,  S.B. 1837 reestablishes the council for another four years, with a report of its findings due by December 1 of even-numbered years. The bill also authorizes the commissioner of state health services to accept gifts, grants and donations on behalf of the council to fulfill the council's purposes.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 1, Chapter 994 (S.B. 1566), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, by adding Subsection (i-1), and amending Subsections (k) and (n), as follows:   (i-1) Authorizes the commissioner of state health services to accept on behalf of the Texas Bleeding Disorders Advisory Council (council) gifts, grants, and donations to fulfill the council's purposes under this section.   (k) Requires the council, not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year, rather than December 1, 2008, to report on its findings and recommendations to the governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives.   (n) Provides that this section expires and the council is abolished September 1, 2013, rather than September 1, 2009.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.     

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 1837

81R12349 YDB-D By: Patrick, Dan

 Health & Human Services

 4/9/2009

 As Filed

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

The Texas Bleeding Disorders Advisory Council (council) was created upon passage of S.B. 1566, Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, as a two-year study of issues that affect the health and well-being of persons with bleeding disorders, such as hemophilia, in Texas.

 

As proposed,  S.B. 1837 reestablishes the council for another four years, with a report of its findings due by December 1 of even-numbered years. The bill also authorizes the commissioner of state health services to accept gifts, grants and donations on behalf of the council to fulfill the council's purposes.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 1, Chapter 994 (S.B. 1566), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, by adding Subsection (i-1), and amending Subsections (k) and (n), as follows:

 

(i-1) Authorizes the commissioner of state health services to accept on behalf of the Texas Bleeding Disorders Advisory Council (council) gifts, grants, and donations to fulfill the council's purposes under this section.

 

(k) Requires the council, not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year, rather than December 1, 2008, to report on its findings and recommendations to the governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives.

 

(n) Provides that this section expires and the council is abolished September 1, 2013, rather than September 1, 2009.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.