E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
05/22/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4350
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2732
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2639
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1018
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 4123
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4123
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4050
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4050
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1185
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 991
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 991
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 991
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 991
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 991
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 991
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 991
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 838
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 640
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 640
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|