Senate | 04/24/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1418 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 879 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 640 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 640 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |