House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3486
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3435
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3435
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 683
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|