Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1861 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R6679 ACP-D
 By: Ellis S.B. No. 1861


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain programs and pilot programs administered by the
 Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 2306.0971 and 2306.0972 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 2306.0971.  SUPPLEMENTAL WEATHERIZATION ASSISTANCE
 PROGRAM. (a)  In addition to the Energy Services Program for
 Low-Income Individuals established under Section 2306.097, the
 department shall establish a program that provides financial
 assistance for residential weatherization measures that do not
 qualify for the state's allocation of federal funds under the Low
 Income Home Energy Assistance Program but that, if performed, would
 allow a person to receive that federal assistance.
 (b)  The department by rule shall establish eligibility
 criteria for a person to receive financial assistance for
 residential weatherization measures under this section. The
 criteria must ensure that any weatherization measures performed
 will allow a person to receive federal assistance under the Low
 Income Home Energy Assistance Program.
 (c)  The department shall collaborate with the state energy
 conservation office and the Energy Systems Laboratory at the Texas
 Engineering Experiment Station of The Texas A&M University System
 to identify cost-effective residential weatherization measures
 that allow persons to qualify for the Low Income Home Energy
 Assistance Program.
 Sec. 2306.0972.  WEATHERIZATION PILOT PROGRAM. (a)  The
 department may establish a pilot program to study the effectiveness
 of weatherization measures in increasing residential energy
 efficiency for individuals and families of low income.
 (b)  If the department establishes a pilot program under this
 section, not later than December 1, 2010, the department shall
 submit a report to the legislature regarding its findings and
 recommendations under the pilot program.
 (c) This section expires September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter K, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.260 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.260.  USE OF CERTAIN FEDERAL ASSISTANCE TO FUND
 PILOT PROGRAMS.  The department may fund existing pilot programs or
 create new pilot programs as appropriate using federal supplemental
 appropriations under the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of
 2009 (Pub. L. No. 111-5) or any other similar federal legislation
 that is enacted on or after January 1, 2009. This section expires
 December 31, 2011.
 SECTION 3. The Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs shall adopt the rules required by Section 2306.0971,
 Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than December 1,
 2009.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.