House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1182 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1182 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1182 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1182 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1182 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1181 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1181 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1145 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 683 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 683 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |