Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1867 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ellis S.B. No. 1867
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 14, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to procedures related to the placement of a voter on the
 suspense list.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 14.022, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 14.022. ERRONEOUS RETURN OF RENEWAL CERTIFICATE. A
 voter registrar shall determine whether [If the registrar
 determines that] a voter's renewal certificate was returned
 undelivered solely because of postal service error, address
 reclassification, or the registrar's clerical error. If the
 registrar determines that the certificate was returned solely
 because of that error or reclassification, the registrar shall
 delete the voter's name from the suspense list, make any other
 appropriate corrections in the registration records, and deliver
 the certificate to the voter.
 SECTION 2. Section 16.032, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 16.032. CANCELLATION FOLLOWING END OF SUSPENSE LIST
 PERIOD. (a) If on November 30 following the second general
 election for state and county officers that occurs after the date
 the voter's name is entered on the suspense list a registered
 voter's name appears on the suspense list, the registrar shall
 cancel the voter's registration unless the name is to be deleted
 from the list under Section 15.023.
 (b)  For purposes of Subsection (a), if a voter whose name
 appears on the suspense list is shown to have voted in an election
 and the name is not to be deleted from the list under Section
 15.023, the date on which the voter is considered to have been
 entered on the suspense list is the date of the most recent election
 in which the voter voted.
 SECTION 3. Section 63.0011, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The secretary of state shall adopt rules to provide for
 the uniform and auditable processing of a statement of residence
 required under this section.
 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act to Section
 14.022, Election Code, applies only to a voter registration renewal
 certificate returned undelivered and received by a voter registrar
 on or after the effective date of this Act. A voter registration
 renewal certificate returned undelivered and received by a voter
 registrar before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect when the registrar received the undelivered
 certificate, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *