Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1872 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1872
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 16, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of information and records acquired during a
 fatality review and investigation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 672.009, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Information, documents, and records that are
 confidential as provided by this section are not subject to
 subpoena or discovery and may not be introduced into evidence in any
 civil or criminal proceeding. A document or other information that
 is otherwise available from another source is not protected from
 subpoena, discovery, or introduction into evidence under this
 subsection solely because the document or information was acquired
 by a review team in the exercise of its duties under this chapter.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 civil or criminal proceeding commenced on or after the effective
 date of this Act. A civil or criminal proceeding commenced before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before that date, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *