Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1877 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nelson, et al. S.B. No. 1877


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Texas Medical Child Abuse Resources
 and Education System grant program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 1001, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter F to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER F.  TEXAS MEDICAL CHILD ABUSE RESOURCES AND EDUCATION
 SYSTEM (MEDCARES)
 Sec. 1001.151.  TEXAS MEDICAL CHILD ABUSE RESOURCES AND
 EDUCATION SYSTEM GRANT PROGRAM.  (a)  The department shall
 establish the Texas Medical Child Abuse Resources and Education
 System (MEDCARES) grant program to award grants for the purpose of
 developing and supporting regional programs to improve the
 assessment, diagnosis, and treatment of child abuse and neglect as
 described by the report submitted to the 80th Legislature by the
 committee on pediatric centers of excellence relating to abuse and
 neglect in accordance with Section 266.0031, Family Code, as added
 by Chapter 1406 (S.B. 758), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2007.
 (b)  The department may award grants to hospitals or academic
 health centers with expertise in pediatric health care and a
 demonstrated commitment to developing basic and advanced programs
 and centers of excellence for the assessment, diagnosis, and
 treatment of child abuse and neglect.
 (c)  The department shall encourage collaboration among
 grant recipients in the development of program services and
 activities.
 Sec. 1001.152.  USE OF GRANT. A grant awarded under this
 subchapter may be used to support:
 (1)  comprehensive medical evaluations, psychosocial
 assessments, treatment services, and written and photographic
 documentation of abuse;
 (2)  education and training for health professionals,
 including physicians, medical students, resident physicians, child
 abuse fellows, and nurses, relating to the assessment, diagnosis,
 and treatment of child abuse and neglect;
 (3)  education and training for community agencies
 involved with child abuse and neglect, law enforcement officials,
 child protective services staff, and children's advocacy centers
 involved with child abuse and neglect;
 (4)  medical case reviews and consultations and
 testimony regarding those reviews and consultations;
 (5)  research, data collection, and quality assurance
 activities, including the development of evidence-based guidelines
 and protocols for the prevention, evaluation, and treatment of
 child abuse and neglect;
 (6)  the use of telemedicine and other means to extend
 services from regional programs into underserved areas; and
 (7)  other necessary activities, services, supplies,
 facilities, and equipment as determined by the department.
 Sec. 1001.153.  MEDCARES ADVISORY COMMITTEE.  The executive
 commissioner shall establish an advisory committee to advise the
 department and the executive commissioner in establishing rules and
 priorities for the use of grant funds awarded through the program.
 The advisory committee is composed of the following nine members:
 (1)  the state Medicaid director or the state Medicaid
 director's designee;
 (2)  the medical director for the Department of Family
 and Protective Services or the medical director's designee; and
 (3) as appointed by the executive commissioner:
 (A)  two pediatricians with expertise in child
 abuse or neglect;
 (B)  a nurse with expertise in child abuse or
 neglect;
 (C)  a representative of a pediatric residency
 training program;
 (D) a representative of a children's hospital;
 (E)  a representative of a children's advocacy
 center; and
 (F)  a member of the Governor's EMS and Trauma
 Advisory Council.
 Sec. 1001.154.  GIFTS AND GRANTS.  The department may
 solicit and accept gifts, grants, and donations from any public or
 private source for the purposes of this subchapter.
 Sec. 1001.155.  REQUIRED REPORT.  Not later than December 1
 of each even-numbered year, the department, with the assistance of
 the advisory committee established under this subchapter, shall
 submit a report to the governor and the legislature regarding the
 grant activities of the program and grant recipients, including the
 results and outcomes of grants provided under this subchapter.
 Sec. 1001.156.  RULES.  The executive commissioner may adopt
 rules as necessary to implement this subchapter.
 Sec. 1001.157.  APPROPRIATION REQUIRED.  The department is
 not required to award a grant under this subchapter unless the
 department is specifically appropriated money for purposes of this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than November 1, 2009, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall appoint the members of the advisory committee as required by
 Section 1001.153, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 (b) Not later than January 1, 2010, the Department of State
 Health Services shall establish and implement a grant program as
 described by Subchapter F, Chapter 1001, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act.
 (c) Not later than December 1, 2010, the Department of State
 Health Services shall provide the initial report to the governor
 and the legislature as required by Section 1001.155, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 Section 4. This Act does not make an appropriation. This
 Act takes effect only if a specific appropriation for the
 implementation of the Act is provided in a general appropriations
 act of the 81st Legislature.
 SECTION 5. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.