Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1892 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gallegos S.B. No. 1892
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 30, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 30, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1892 By: Gallegos


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing of court interpreters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 57.002, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A licensed court interpreter appointed by a court
 under Subsection (a) or (b) must hold a license that includes the
 appropriate designation under Section 57.043(d) that indicates the
 interpreter is permitted to interpret in that court.
 SECTION 2. Section 57.043, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read
 as follows:
 (a) The executive director shall issue a court interpreter
 license to an applicant who:
 (1) can interpret for an individual who can hear but
 who does not comprehend English or communicate in English;
 (2) passes the appropriate examination prescribed by
 the executive director not earlier than two years before the date
 the executive director receives the applicant's application for a
 license; and
 (3) possesses the other qualifications for the license
 required by this subchapter or by rules adopted under this
 subchapter.
 (d)  A license issued under this subchapter must include at
 least one of the following designations:
 (1)  a basic designation that permits the interpreter
 to interpret court proceedings in justice courts and municipal
 courts created under Chapter 29, other than proceedings referred by
 the judges of those courts to a magistrate, master, referee,
 associate judge, or hearing officer; or
 (2)  a master designation that permits the interpreter
 to interpret court proceedings in all courts in this state,
 including justice courts and municipal courts created under Chapter
 29.
 (e)  In adopting rules relating to licensing under this
 subchapter, the commission shall, after consulting with the board,
 prescribe the minimum score an individual must achieve on an
 examination to receive a license that includes a basic designation
 under Subsection (d) and the minimum score an individual must
 achieve to receive a license that includes a master designation
 under that subsection.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (a), Section 57.046, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The executive director shall prepare examinations under
 this subchapter that test an applicant's knowledge, skill, and
 efficiency in interpreting under this subchapter. The same
 examinations must be used for issuing a license that includes a
 basic designation or master designation as described by Section
 57.043(d).
 SECTION 4. (a) Notwithstanding Subsection (e), Section
 57.043, Government Code, as added by this Act, and not later than
 December 1, 2009, the executive director of the Texas Department of
 Licensing and Regulation shall issue to a person who, on September
 1, 2009, holds a court interpreter license issued under Subsection
 (a), Section 57.043, Government Code, a new court interpreter
 license that includes a master designation described by Subdivision
 (2), Subsection (d), Section 57.043, Government Code, as added by
 this Act.
 (b) Subsection (d), Section 57.043, Government Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to a court interpreter license,
 other than a court interpreter license issued under Subsection (a)
 of this section, that is initially issued under Subsection (a),
 Section 57.043, Government Code, as amended by this Act, on or after
 September 1, 2009, and to the subsequent renewal of that license.
 (c) Subsection (b-1), Section 57.002, Government Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to the appointment of a licensed
 court interpreter on or after January 1, 2010. An appointment
 before that date is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 appointment was made, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *