House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4570 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2298 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1800 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1800 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1800 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1799 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1799 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1799 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1799 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1296 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |