House | 05/21/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3801 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1569 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1120 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1120 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1120 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 686 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |