House | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 4073 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4073 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3952 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2491 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2491 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2491 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2490 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2490 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2490 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2490 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Duncan | Journal Page: 2490 |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2490 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2490 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1711 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 687 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 687 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |