Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1919 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1919


 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for recording a property owners'
 association management certificate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 209.004, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (c) and adding Subsections (d), (e),
 and (f) to read as follows:
 (a) A property owners' association shall record in each
 county in which any portion of the residential subdivision is
 located a management certificate, signed and acknowledged by an
 officer or the managing agent of the association, stating:
 (1) the name of the subdivision;
 (2) the name of the association;
 (3) the recording data for the subdivision;
 (4) the recording data for the declaration;
 (5) the name and mailing address of the association;
 (6) [or] the name and mailing address of the person
 managing the association or the association's designated
 representative; and
 (7) [(6)] other information the association considers
 appropriate.
 (c) Except as provided under Subsections (d) and (e), the
 [The] property owners' association and its officers, directors,
 employees, and agents are not subject to liability to any person for
 a delay in recording or failure to record a management certificate,
 unless the delay or failure is wilful or caused by gross negligence.
 (d)  If a property owners' association fails to record a
 management certificate or an amended management certificate under
 this section, the purchaser, lender, or title insurance company or
 its agent in a transaction involving property in the property
 owners' association is not liable to the property owners'
 association for:
 (1)  any amount due to the association on the date of a
 transfer to a bona fide purchaser; and
 (2)  any debt to or claim of the association that
 accrued before the date of a transfer to a bona fide purchaser.
 (e)  A lien of a property owners' association that fails to
 file a management certificate or an amended management certificate
 under this section to secure an amount due on the effective date of
 a transfer to a bona fide purchaser is enforceable only for an
 amount incurred after the effective date of sale.
 (f)  For purposes of this section, "bona fide purchaser"
 means:
 (1)  a person who pays valuable consideration without
 notice of outstanding rights of others and acts in good faith; or
 (2)  a third-party lender who acquires a security
 interest in the property under a deed of trust.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a transfer of an interest to a bona fide purchaser on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A transfer of an interest to a bona fide
 purchaser before the effective date of this Act is covered by the
 law in effect when the transaction occurred, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. A property owners' association that exists on
 September 1, 2009, shall file the information required by the
 changes in law made by this Act not later than May 1, 2010.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1919 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1919 passed the House on
 May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor