E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5157 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5156 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6896 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4680 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4512 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 4131 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | RV#1376 | Journal Page: 5143 |
House | 05/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 5143 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5143 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5071 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5071 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/25/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/24/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 3435 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3435 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2453 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2096 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 689 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 689 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |