House
|
05/27/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar on 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5145
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/27/09 12:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4966
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4966
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4965
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1339
|
Journal Page: 4965
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Failed to pass
|
|
Journal Page: 4965
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4965
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4616
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Oliveira
|
Journal Page: 4616
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4616
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4286
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|