House
|
05/27/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 5071
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4354
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 3170
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3170
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2869
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Jackson
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2124
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2124
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2118
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2118
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|