Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1966 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1966


 AN ACT
 relating to debt cancellation agreements offered in connection with
 motor vehicle retail installment contracts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 348.001, Finance Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Debt cancellation agreement" means a retail
 installment contract term or a contractual arrangement modifying a
 retail installment contract term under which a retail seller or
 holder agrees to cancel all or part of an obligation of the retail
 buyer to repay an extension of credit from the retail seller or
 holder on the occurrence of the total loss or theft of the motor
 vehicle that is the subject of the retail installment contract but
 does not include an offer to pay a specified amount on the total
 loss or theft of the motor vehicle.
 SECTION 2. Section 348.005, Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 348.005. ITEMIZED CHARGE. An amount in a retail
 installment contract is an itemized charge if the amount is not
 included in the cash price and is the amount of:
 (1) fees for registration, certificate of title, and
 license and any additional registration fees charged by a full
 service deputy under Section 502.114, Transportation Code;
 (2) any taxes;
 (3) fees or charges prescribed by law and connected
 with the sale or inspection of the motor vehicle; and
 (4) charges authorized for insurance, service
 contracts, [or] warranties, or a debt cancellation agreement by
 Subchapter C.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 348, Finance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 348.124 to read as follows:
 Sec. 348.124.  DEBT CANCELLATION AGREEMENTS. (a)  In
 connection with a retail installment transaction under this
 chapter, a retail seller may offer to the retail buyer a debt
 cancellation agreement. The retail seller may not require that the
 purchase of a debt cancellation agreement by the retail buyer be
 made in order to enter into a retail installment transaction.
 (b)  A debt cancellation agreement is not considered an
 insurance product.
 (c)  The amount charged for a debt cancellation agreement
 made in connection with a retail installment contract must be
 reasonable.
 (d)  In addition to other disclosures required by state or
 federal law, the retail seller shall provide to the retail buyer a
 separate notice in connection with the retail installment contract
 stating that the retail buyer is not required to accept or provide a
 debt cancellation agreement in order to purchase the motor vehicle
 under a retail installment contract.
 SECTION 4. Subsections (b) and (c), Section 348.208,
 Finance Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b) A retail installment contract may include as a separate
 charge an amount for:
 (1) motor vehicle property damage or bodily injury
 liability insurance;
 (2) mechanical breakdown insurance;
 (3) participation in a motor vehicle theft protection
 plan;
 (4) insurance to reimburse the retail buyer for the
 amount computed by subtracting the proceeds of the buyer's basic
 collision policy on the motor vehicle from the amount owed on the
 vehicle if the vehicle has been rendered a total loss; [or]
 (5) a warranty or service contract relating to the
 motor vehicle; or
 (6)  a debt cancellation agreement if the agreement is
 included as a term of a retail installment contract under Section
 348.124.
 (c) Notwithstanding any other law, service contracts and
 debt cancellation agreements sold by a retail seller of a motor
 vehicle to a retail buyer are not subject to Chapter 101 or 226,
 Insurance Code.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1966 passed the Senate on
 April 16, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 12, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1966 passed the House, with
 amendment, on April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor