House | 05/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 1655 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1655 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1274 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1066 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1066 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1066 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1066 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1066 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1066 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1066 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 693 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 693 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |