House
|
05/22/2009
|
1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
|
|
Journal Page: 4334
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1155
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1155
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1155
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1155
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1155
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1155
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1154
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Whitmire
|
Journal Page: 1153
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1153
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1153
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 899
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|