E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5977
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4137
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4207
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3544
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1366
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4578
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2866
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2866
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2433
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 694
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|