House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2425 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2133 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1694 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1694 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1694 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1693 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1693 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1693 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1693 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Watson | Journal Page: 1691 |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 597 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 597 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |