Senate | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 696 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 696 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |