House | 04/22/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1299 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1197 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1197 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1197 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1196 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1196 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Ogden | Journal Page: 1196 |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1196 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1196 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1195 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1195 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |